Senate | 04/29/2019 | File Number 837 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 438 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/22/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/12/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 02/22/2019 | Public Hearing 02/27 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |