Senate
|
06/28/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2019
|
Public Act 19-62
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
House Calendar Number 550
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7891
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
File Number 167
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 104
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/07
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|