Senate
|
07/12/2019
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2019
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2019
|
Public Act 19-128
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Calendar Number 696
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 10260
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
File Number 595
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 284
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2019
|
Public Hearing 03/06
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|