Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00978 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/27/2019

                        
 
LCO No. 4885  	1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Raised Bill No. 978  
January Session, 2019  
LCO No. 4885 
 
 
Referred to Committee on INSURANCE AND REAL ESTATE  
 
 
Introduced by:  
(INS)  
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TE ACHERS' RETIREMENT SYSTEM 
CONTRIBUTIONS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subdivision (7) of section 10-183b of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 2 
October 1, 2019): 3 
(7) "Contributions" means amounts withheld pursuant to this 4 
chapter and paid to the board by an employer from compensation 5 
payable to a member. Prior to July 1, 1989, "mandatory contributions" 6 
are contributions required to be withheld under this chapter and 7 
consist of five per cent regular contributions and "one per cent 8 
contributions". From July 1, 1989, to June 30, 1992, "mandatory 9 
contributions" are contributions required to be withheld under this 10 
chapter and consist of five per cent regular contributions and one per 11 
cent health contributions. From July 1, 1992, to June 30, 2004, 12 
"mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 13 
under this chapter and consist of six per cent "regular contributions" 14 
and one per cent health contributions. From July 1, 2004, to December 15  Raised Bill No.  978 
 
 
 
LCO No. 4885   	2 of 2 
 
31, 2017, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be 16 
withheld under this chapter and consist of six per cent regular 17 
contributions and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. 18 
[On and after] From January 1, 2018, to December 31, 2019, inclusive, 19 
"mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 20 
under this chapter and consist of seven per cent "regular contributions" 21 
and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. On and after 22 
January 1, 2020, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required 23 
to be withheld under this chapter and consist of seven per cent 24 
"regular contributions" and one and one-fourth per cent health 25 
contributions, except that no health contributions shall be required for 26 
an employee of the Technical Education and Career System established 27 
pursuant to section 10-95 that (A) has completed the vesting service 28 
necessary to receive health benefits provided to retired state 29 
employees, and (B) does not participate in any group health insurance 30 
plans maintained for retired teachers. "Voluntary contributions" are 31 
contributions by a member authorized to be withheld under section 32 
10-183i. 33 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 10-183b(7) 
 
Statement of Purpose:   
To exempt certain employees of the Technical Education and Career 
System from mandatory health contributions to the Teachers' 
Retirement System. 
[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, 
except that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is 
not underlined.]