14 | | - | Section 1. Subdivision (7) of section 10-183b of the general statutes is |
---|
15 | | - | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective |
---|
16 | | - | October 1, 2019): |
---|
17 | | - | (7) "Contributions" means amounts withheld pursuant to this |
---|
18 | | - | chapter and paid to the board by an employer from compensation |
---|
19 | | - | payable to a member. Prior to July 1, 1989, "mandatory contributions" |
---|
20 | | - | are contributions required to be withheld under this chapter and |
---|
21 | | - | consist of five per cent regular contributions and "one per cent |
---|
22 | | - | contributions". From July 1, 1989, to June 30, 1992, "mandatory |
---|
23 | | - | contributions" are contributions required to be withheld under this |
---|
24 | | - | chapter and consist of five per cent regular contributions and one per |
---|
25 | | - | cent health contributions. From July 1, 1992, to June 30, 2004, |
---|
26 | | - | "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld |
---|
27 | | - | under this chapter and consist of six per cent "regular contributions" |
---|
28 | | - | and one per cent health contributions. From July 1, 2004, to December |
---|
29 | | - | 31, 2017, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be |
---|
30 | | - | withheld under this chapter and consist of six per cent regular |
---|
31 | | - | contributions and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. Substitute Senate Bill No. 978 |
---|
| 19 | + | Section 1. Subdivision (7) of section 10-183b of the general statutes is 1 |
---|
| 20 | + | repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 2 |
---|
| 21 | + | October 1, 2019): 3 |
---|
| 22 | + | (7) "Contributions" means amounts withheld pursuant to this 4 |
---|
| 23 | + | chapter and paid to the board by an employer from compensation 5 |
---|
| 24 | + | payable to a member. Prior to July 1, 1989, "mandatory contributions" 6 |
---|
| 25 | + | are contributions required to be withheld under this chapter and 7 |
---|
| 26 | + | consist of five per cent regular contributions and "one per cent 8 |
---|
| 27 | + | contributions". From July 1, 1989, to June 30, 1992, "mandatory 9 |
---|
| 28 | + | contributions" are contributions required to be withheld under this 10 |
---|
| 29 | + | chapter and consist of five per cent regular contributions and one per 11 |
---|
| 30 | + | cent health contributions. From July 1, 1992, to June 30, 2004, 12 |
---|
| 31 | + | "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 13 |
---|
| 32 | + | under this chapter and consist of six per cent "regular contributions" 14 |
---|
| 33 | + | and one per cent health contributions. From July 1, 2004, to December 15 |
---|
| 34 | + | 31, 2017, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be 16 |
---|
| 35 | + | withheld under this chapter and consist of six per cent regular 17 |
---|
| 36 | + | contributions and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. 18 |
---|
| 37 | + | [On and after] From January 1, 2018, to December 31, 2019, inclusive, 19 Substitute Bill No. 978 |
---|
35 | | - | [On and after] From January 1, 2018, to December 31, 2019, inclusive, |
---|
36 | | - | "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld |
---|
37 | | - | under this chapter and consist of seven per cent "regular contributions" |
---|
38 | | - | and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. On and after |
---|
39 | | - | January 1, 2020, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required |
---|
40 | | - | to be withheld under this chapter and consist of seven per cent |
---|
41 | | - | "regular contributions" and one and one-fourth per cent health |
---|
42 | | - | contributions, except that no health contributions shall be required for |
---|
43 | | - | an employee of the state that (A) has completed the vesting service |
---|
44 | | - | necessary to receive health benefits provided to retired state |
---|
45 | | - | employees, and (B) does not participate in any group health insurance |
---|
46 | | - | plans maintained for retired teachers. Nothing in this subdivision shall |
---|
47 | | - | affect any other obligation of such a state employee to contribute to the |
---|
48 | | - | state's retiree health care trust fund. "Voluntary contributions" are |
---|
49 | | - | contributions by a member authorized to be withheld under section |
---|
50 | | - | 10-183i. |
---|
| 40 | + | LCO {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00978- |
---|
| 41 | + | R02-SB.docx } |
---|
| 42 | + | 2 of 2 |
---|
| 43 | + | |
---|
| 44 | + | "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 20 |
---|
| 45 | + | under this chapter and consist of seven per cent "regular contributions" 21 |
---|
| 46 | + | and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. On and after 22 |
---|
| 47 | + | January 1, 2020, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required 23 |
---|
| 48 | + | to be withheld under this chapter and consist of seven per cent 24 |
---|
| 49 | + | "regular contributions" and one and one-fourth per cent health 25 |
---|
| 50 | + | contributions, except that no health contributions shall be required for: 26 |
---|
| 51 | + | (A) An employee of the Technical Education and Career System 27 |
---|
| 52 | + | established pursuant to section 10-95 that (i) has completed the vesting 28 |
---|
| 53 | + | service necessary to receive health benefits provided to retired state 29 |
---|
| 54 | + | employees, and (ii) does not participate in any group health insurance 30 |
---|
| 55 | + | plans maintained for retired teachers; or (B) a state employee who (i) is 31 |
---|
| 56 | + | employed by an executive branch agency of state government, and (ii) 32 |
---|
| 57 | + | does not participate in the teachers' retirement system. "Voluntary 33 |
---|
| 58 | + | contributions" are contributions by a member authorized to be 34 |
---|
| 59 | + | withheld under section 10-183i. 35 |
---|
| 60 | + | This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following |
---|
| 61 | + | sections: |
---|
| 62 | + | |
---|
| 63 | + | Section 1 October 1, 2019 10-183b(7) |
---|
| 64 | + | |
---|
| 65 | + | INS Joint Favorable Subst. |
---|
| 66 | + | FIN Joint Favorable |
---|