Connecticut 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00978 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/18/2019

                             
 
 
Substitute Senate Bill No. 978 
 
Public Act No. 19-73 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TE ACHERS' RETIREMENT S YSTEM 
CONTRIBUTIONS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subdivision (7) of section 10-183b of the general statutes is 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 
October 1, 2019): 
(7) "Contributions" means amounts withheld pursuant to this 
chapter and paid to the board by an employer from compensation 
payable to a member. Prior to July 1, 1989, "mandatory contributions" 
are contributions required to be withheld under this chapter and 
consist of five per cent regular contributions and "one per cent 
contributions". From July 1, 1989, to June 30, 1992, "mandatory 
contributions" are contributions required to be withheld under this 
chapter and consist of five per cent regular contributions and one per 
cent health contributions. From July 1, 1992, to June 30, 2004, 
"mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 
under this chapter and consist of six per cent "regular contributions" 
and one per cent health contributions. From July 1, 2004, to December 
31, 2017, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be 
withheld under this chapter and consist of six per cent regular 
contributions and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions.  Substitute Senate Bill No. 978 
 
Public Act No. 19-73 	2 of 2 
 
[On and after] From January 1, 2018, to December 31, 2019, inclusive, 
"mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 
under this chapter and consist of seven per cent "regular contributions" 
and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. On and after 
January 1, 2020, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required 
to be withheld under this chapter and consist of seven per cent 
"regular contributions" and one and one-fourth per cent health 
contributions, except that no health contributions shall be required for 
an employee of the state that (A) has completed the vesting service 
necessary to receive health benefits provided to retired state 
employees, and (B) does not participate in any group health insurance 
plans maintained for retired teachers. Nothing in this subdivision shall 
affect any other obligation of such a state employee to contribute to the 
state's retiree health care trust fund. "Voluntary contributions" are 
contributions by a member authorized to be withheld under section 
10-183i.