Connecticut 2019 2019 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00978 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                     
 
LCO    \\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00978-R02-
SB.docx  
1 of 2 
 
General Assembly  Substitute Bill No. 978  
January Session, 2019 
 
 
 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING TE ACHERS' RETIREMENT S YSTEM 
CONTRIBUTIONS.  
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. Subdivision (7) of section 10-183b of the general statutes is 1 
repealed and the following is substituted in lieu thereof (Effective 2 
October 1, 2019): 3 
(7) "Contributions" means amounts withheld pursuant to this 4 
chapter and paid to the board by an employer from compensation 5 
payable to a member. Prior to July 1, 1989, "mandatory contributions" 6 
are contributions required to be withheld under this chapter and 7 
consist of five per cent regular contributions and "one per cent 8 
contributions". From July 1, 1989, to June 30, 1992, "mandatory 9 
contributions" are contributions required to be withheld under this 10 
chapter and consist of five per cent regular contributions and one per 11 
cent health contributions. From July 1, 1992, to June 30, 2004, 12 
"mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 13 
under this chapter and consist of six per cent "regular contributions" 14 
and one per cent health contributions. From July 1, 2004, to December 15 
31, 2017, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be 16 
withheld under this chapter and consist of six per cent regular 17 
contributions and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. 18 
[On and after] From January 1, 2018, to December 31, 2019, inclusive, 19  Substitute Bill No. 978 
 
 
LCO    {\\PRDFS1\SCOUSERS\FORZANOF\WS\2019SB-00978-
R02-SB.docx }   
2 of 2 
 
"mandatory contributions" are contributions required to be withheld 20 
under this chapter and consist of seven per cent "regular contributions" 21 
and one and one-fourth per cent health contributions. On and after 22 
January 1, 2020, "mandatory contributions" are contributions required 23 
to be withheld under this chapter and consist of seven per cent 24 
"regular contributions" and one and one-fourth per cent health 25 
contributions, except that no health contributions shall be required for: 26 
(A) An employee of the Technical Education and Career System 27 
established pursuant to section 10-95 that (i) has completed the vesting 28 
service necessary to receive health benefits provided to retired state 29 
employees, and (ii) does not participate in any group health insurance 30 
plans maintained for retired teachers; or (B) a state employee who (i) is 31 
employed by an executive branch agency of state government, and (ii) 32 
does not participate in the teachers' retirement system. "Voluntary 33 
contributions" are contributions by a member authorized to be 34 
withheld under section 10-183i. 35 
This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following 
sections: 
 
Section 1 October 1, 2019 10-183b(7) 
 
INS Joint Favorable Subst.  
FIN Joint Favorable