Senate | 04/02/2019 | File Number 329 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 173 | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/02/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/26/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/18/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/01/2019 | Public Hearing 03/07 | ||
Senate | 02/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |