Senate | 05/10/2019 | House Calendar Number 547 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | File Number 728 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 335 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/08/2019 | Public Hearing 03/13 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |