Senate | 04/24/2019 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | File Number 660 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 319 | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/28/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/25/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Public Hearing 03/18 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |