Senate | 05/16/2019 | House Calendar Number 609 | ||
Senate | 05/16/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2019 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8538 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | File Number 551 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 249 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/19 10:00 AM | ||
Senate | 03/22/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/14/2019 | Public Hearing 03/19 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |