Senate | 06/28/2019 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
Senate | 06/17/2019 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
Senate | 06/12/2019 | Public Act 19-43 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | House Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | House Calendar Number 519 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2019 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | File Number 743 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 343 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/11/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/01/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/29/2019 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 03/21/2019 | Public Hearing 03/25 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |