House
|
06/03/2019
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2019
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 10463
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
House Calendar Number 701
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
File Number 951
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Senate Calendar Number 567
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/21/19 5:00 PM
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2019
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2019
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2019
|
Public Hearing 04/29
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2019
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|