Senate | 05/14/2019 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Adopted, House | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | House Calendar Number 538 | ||
Senate | 05/10/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | On Consent Calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 459 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/30/2019 | Public Hearing 04/30 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2019 | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |