Senate | 02/20/2019 | Adopted, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | File Number 6 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Senate Calendar Number 20 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/15/2019 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/21/19 5:00 PM | ||
Senate | 02/13/2019 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 02/11/2019 | Senate Favorable | ||
Senate | 01/29/2019 | Public Hearing 02/11 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2019 | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/25/2019 | Filed with Senate Clerks |