Senate | 06/03/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 549 | ||
Senate | 06/03/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 06/02/2021 | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate | ||
House | 06/02/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | File Number 375 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | House Calendar Number 288 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Public Hearing 02/11 |