House | 03/24/2021 | File Number 117 | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | House Calendar Number 116 | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
House | 01/22/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |