Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Public Act 21-5
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Signed by Governor in Original
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 354
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
File Number 254
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
House Calendar Number 208
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|