Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05377 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill January 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 10, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021
Bill March 16, 2021

Chaptered

Bill May 5, 2021