House
|
06/28/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Public Act 21-79
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
File Number 673
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 414
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8049
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
File Number 255
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
House Calendar Number 209
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/11
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|