Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05592 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note April 6, 2021
Bill January 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 7, 2021
Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis May 8, 2021
Bill April 6, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2021