Senate
|
07/06/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2021
|
Public Act 21-113
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
File Number 785
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 557
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9972
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
File Number 410
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
House Calendar Number 311
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/24
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|