Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05597 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note June 3, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 13, 2021
Bill January 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 29, 2021
Analysis June 4, 2021
Bill April 13, 2021
Analysis April 13, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2021