House | 05/27/2021 | File Number 746 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 514 | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8024 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | File Number 466 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 333 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Public Hearing 03/03 | ||
House | 01/26/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |