Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05598 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 5, 2021
Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Bill January 25, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 26, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021