Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05653 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Bill January 26, 2021

Chaptered

Bill May 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 12, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021