House
|
06/14/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Public Act 21-36
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
File Number 747
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 516
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8780
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
File Number 427
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
House Calendar Number 319
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/24
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Change of Reference Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services
|
|
|