Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 14, 2021
Bill January 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 19, 2021
Analysis May 27, 2021
Analysis May 26, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021
Analysis April 14, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 7, 2021