Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05677 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 04/14/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	4/14/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5677  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE AVAILABILITY OF COMMUNITY 
VIOLENCE PREVENTION SERVICES UNDER MEDICAID.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Social Services (DSS) 
commissioner, in consultation with the Department of Public Health 
(DPH) commissioner, to amend the state Medicaid plan to provide 
coverage for community violence prevention services for beneficiaries 
who have: 
1. received medical treatment for an injury sustained from an act 
of community violence (i.e., an intentional act of interpersonal 
violence committed by someone not intimately related to the 
victim) and  
2. been referred by a certified or licensed health care or social 
services provider to receive these services from a “qualified 
violence prevention professional” after the provider determined 
the beneficiary is at a higher risk of retaliation or a violent injury 
from another act of community violence. 
 Under the bill, the DSS commissioner must do this by July 1, 2022, 
provided (1) federal law permits it; (2) federal financial participation is 
available; and (3) any needed federal approval is obtained, including 
Medicaid waivers or state plan amendments.  
Additionally, the bill establishes education and training 
requirements for individuals seeking certification as a “qualified 
violence prevention professional” and requires DPH, by January 1, 
2022, to approve at least one accrediting body to review and approve 
training and certification programs for these professionals. It also 
establishes documentation and compliance requirements for entities 
that employ or contract with these professionals to provide community  2021HB-05677-R000427-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	4/14/21 
 
violence prevention services. 
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021 
COMMUNITY VIOLENCE P REVENTION SERVICES 
The bill defines “community violence prevention services” as 
evidenced-based, trauma-informed, supportive, and non -
psychotherapeutic services provided by a qualified violence 
prevention professional to: 
1. promote improved health outcomes and positive behavioral 
change, 
2. prevent injury recidivism, and  
3. reduce the likelihood that victims of community violence will 
commit or promote violence themselves.  
Under the bill, these services may be provided within or outside of a 
clinical setting and may include the provision of the following services 
to community violence victims: peer support or counseling, 
mentorship, conflict mediation, crisis intervention, targeted case 
management, referrals to certified or licensed health care or social 
services providers, patient education, or screening services. 
QUALIFIED VIOLENCE PREVENTION PROF ESSIONALS 
Training Requirements 
Under the bill, a prevention professional (see BACKGROUND) 
seeking certification as a qualified violence prevention professional 
must: 
1. complete at least six months of full-time equivalent experience 
in providing community violence prevention services through 
employment, volunteer work, or an internship; 
2. complete a DPH-approved accredited training and certification 
program for qualified violence prevention professionals or be 
certified as a violence prevention professional by the Health 
Alliance for Violence Intervention before October 1, 2021;  2021HB-05677-R000427-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	4/14/21 
 
3. annually complete at least four hours of continuing education 
offered by the Health Alliance for Violence Intervention or any 
other DPH-approved provider of communi ty violence 
prevention services; and 
4. satisfy any other requirements DPH establishes.  
Accrediting Body 
The bill requires DPH, by January 1, 2022, to approve at least one 
accrediting body to review and approve training and certification 
programs for qualified violence prevention professionals. The 
accrediting body may be governmental or nongovernmental and must 
have expertise in community violence prevention. 
Under the bill, the accrediting body must approve programs it 
determines, in its discretion, will adequately prepare individuals to 
provide community violence prevention services to community 
violence victims. The bill requires these programs to include at least 35 
hours of training and address: 
1. the profound effects of trauma and violence and the basics of 
trauma-informed care; 
2. community violence prevention strategies, including conflict 
mediation and retaliation prevention;  
3. case management and advocacy practices; and  
4. HIPAA’s patient privacy requirements. 
Documentation and Compliance 
The bill requires any entity that employs or contracts with a 
qualified violence prevention professional to provide community 
violence prevention services to: 
1. maintain documentation that the professional has met the 
qualifications listed above and  
2. ensure that the professional complies with any applicable state  2021HB-05677-R000427-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 4 	4/14/21 
 
or federal laws, regulations, rules, or standards of care.  
The bill also specifies that it does not alter the scope of practice of 
any health care professional or authorize the delivery of health care 
services in a setting or manner not currently authorized. 
BACKGROUND 
Prevention Professionals 
Prevention professionals work in programs that address specific 
patient needs, such as suicide prevention, violence prevention, alcohol 
and drug avoidance, and tobacco prevention. They generally complete 
training specific to the patient population they work with and work in 
a variety of settings providing various services such as case 
management, provider referral, and mentorship.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 33 Nay 0 (03/29/2021)