Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05677 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 05/26/2021

                     
Researcher: ND 	Page 1 	5/26/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 5677 (as amended by House "A")*  
 
AN ACT CONCERNING THE AVAILABILITY OF COMMUNITY 
VIOLENCE PREVENTION SERVICES UNDER MEDICAID.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill requires the Department of Social Services (DSS) 
commissioner to amend the state Medicaid plan to provide coverage 
for community violence prevention services for beneficiaries who 
have: 
1. received medical treatment for an injury sustained from an act 
of community violence (i.e., an intentional act of interpersonal 
violence committed in public by someone who is not the 
victim’s family member or intimate partner) and  
2. been referred by a certified or licensed health care or social 
services provider to receive these services from a “certified 
violence prevention professional” after the provider determined 
the beneficiary is at a higher risk of retaliation or a violent injury 
from another act of community violence. 
 Under the bill, the DSS commissioner must do this by July 1, 2022, 
provided (1) federal law permits it; (2) federal financial participation is 
available; and (3) any needed federal approval is obtained, including 
Medicaid waivers or state plan amendments.  
Additionally, the bill establishes training requirements for 
individuals seeking certification as a “certified violence prevention 
professional” and requires the Department of Public Health (DPH), by 
January 1, 2022, to approve at least one accredited training and 
certification program for these professionals. It also establishes 
documentation and compliance requirements for entities that employ 
or contract with these professionals to provide community violence  2021HB-05677-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 2 	5/26/21 
 
prevention services. 
*House Amendment “A ” (1) modifies the (a) definitions of 
community violence and community violence prevention services and 
(b) training requirements for certified violence prevention 
professionals, (2) adds the interpersonal violence definition, (3) 
requires DPH to approve at least one accredited training program 
instead of approving an accrediting body to approve these programs, 
(4) removes the requirement that the DSS commissioner amend the 
Medicaid state plan in consultation with the DPH commissioner, and 
(5) adds the provision on title protection for certified violence 
prevention professionals.  
EFFECTIVE DATE:  October 1, 2021 
COMMUNITY VIOLEN CE PREVENTION SERVIC ES 
The bill defines “community violence prevention services” as 
evidenced-based, trauma-informed, supportive, and non -
psychotherapeutic services provided by a certified violence prevention 
professional to: 
1. promote improved health outcomes and positive behavioral 
change, 
2. prevent injury recidivism, and  
3. reduce the likelihood that victims of community violence will 
commit or promote violence themselves.  
Under the bill, these services may be provided within or outside of a 
clinical setting and may include the provision of the following services 
to community violence victims: peer support or counseling, 
mentorship, conflict mediation, crisis intervention, targeted case 
management, referrals to certified or licensed health care or social 
services providers, patient education, or screening services. 
CERTIFIED VIOLENCE PREVENTION PROFESSION ALS 
Training Requirements  2021HB-05677-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 3 	5/26/21 
 
Under the bill, a prevention professional (see BACKGROUND) 
seeking certification as a certified violence prevention professional 
must complete a DPH-approved accredited training and certification 
program for certified violence prevention professionals and maintain 
the certification.  
Training and Certification Program 
The bill requires DPH, by January 1, 2022, to approve at least one 
accredited training and certification program for certified violence 
prevention professionals. The program must include at least 35 hours 
of initial training and address: 
1. the profound effects of trauma and violence and the basics of 
trauma-informed care; 
2. community violence prevention strategies, including conflict 
mediation and retaliation prevention;  
3. case management and advocacy practices; and  
4. HIPAA’s patient privacy requirements. 
Under the bill, the program must also include six hours of 
continuing education every two years.  
Documentation and Compliance 
The bill requires any entity that employs or contracts with a certified 
violence prevention professional to provide community violence 
prevention services to: 
1. maintain documentation that the professional has met the 
qualifications listed above and  
2. ensure that the professional complies with any applicable state 
or federal laws, regulations, rules, or standards of care.  
The bill also specifies that it does not alter the scope of practice of 
any health care professional or authorize the delivery of health care 
services in a setting or manner not currently authorized.  2021HB-05677-R01-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: ND 	Page 4 	5/26/21 
 
Title Protection 
The bill prohibits anyone who is not certified as a violence 
prevention professional under the bill’s requirements from using the 
title “certified violence prevention professional” or any title, words, 
letters, abbreviations, or insignia indicating or implying that he or she 
is a certified violence prevention professional. 
BACKGROUND 
Prevention Professionals 
Prevention professionals work in programs that address specific 
patient needs, such as suicide prevention, violence prevention, alcohol 
and drug avoidance, and tobacco prevention. They generally complete 
training specific to the patient population they work with and work in 
a variety of settings providing various services such as case 
management, provider referral, and mentorship.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Public Health Committee 
Joint Favorable 
Yea 33 Nay 0 (03/29/2021)