House | 03/29/2021 | File Number 148 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | House Calendar Number 137 | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Housing | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/16/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |