Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05702 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 LCO No. 661 1 of 1
44
55 General Assembly Proposed Bill No. 5702
66 January Session, 2021
77 LCO No. 661
88
99
1010 Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES
1111
1212
1313 Introduced by:
1414 REP. HARRISON, 69th Dist.
1515
1616
1717
1818 AN ACT DELAYING SCHEDULED INCREASES IN THE MINIMUM
1919 WAGE.
2020 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
2121 Assembly convened:
2222
2323 That the general statutes be amended to delay the scheduled 1
2424 increases in the minimum wage from August 1, 2021, to January 1, 2023, 2
2525 from July 1, 2022, to January 1, 2024, and from June 1, 2023, to January 3
2626 1, 2025. 4
2727 Statement of Purpose:
2828 To delay scheduled increases in the minimum wage.