Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB05702 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/26/2021

                             
 
LCO No. 661   	1 of 1 
 
General Assembly  Proposed Bill No. 5702  
January Session, 2021  
LCO No. 661 
 
 
Referred to Committee on LABOR AND PUBLIC EMPLOYEES  
 
 
Introduced by:  
REP. HARRISON, 69th Dist. 
 
 
 
AN ACT DELAYING SCHEDULED INCREASES IN THE MINIMUM 
WAGE. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
That the general statutes be amended to delay the scheduled 1 
increases in the minimum wage from August 1, 2021, to January 1, 2023, 2 
from July 1, 2022, to January 1, 2024, and from June 1, 2023, to January 3 
1, 2025. 4 
Statement of Purpose:   
To delay scheduled increases in the minimum wage.