House | 06/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Public Act 21-63 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 459 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | File Number 380 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | House Calendar Number 293 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Public Hearing 03/02 | ||
House | 02/05/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |