Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06038 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Bill January 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 19, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021
Analysis April 12, 2021
Bill March 19, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 9, 2021