House | 04/15/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | File Number 50 | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | House Calendar Number 73 | ||
House | 03/16/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/03 | ||
House | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |