Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06110 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 14, 2021
Fiscal Note May 13, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill January 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 14, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021