House | 05/11/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | File Number 19 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | House Calendar Number 49 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
House | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |