Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 20, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note May 18, 2021
Fiscal Note May 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 9, 2021
Bill January 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis May 19, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021
Analysis March 9, 2021