Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06112 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06112-R01-
4-HB.docx
5-1 of 2
3+LCO No. 2628 1 of 2
64
7-General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6112
5+General Assembly Raised Bill No. 6112
86 January Session, 2021
7+LCO No. 2628
98
9+
10+Referred to Committee on COMMITTEE ON CHILDREN
11+
12+
13+Introduced by:
14+(KID)
1015
1116
1217
1318
1419 AN ACT REQUIRING A SURVEY OF COURT-INVOLVED YOUTHS.
1520 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1621 Assembly convened:
1722
1823 Section 1. (Effective from passage) (a) As used in this section, "court-1
1924 involved youths" means any individual under the age of eighteen years 2
2025 who has had direct interaction with or is engaged in a proceeding before 3
2126 any constituent court of the Judicial Branch, or receives services through 4
2227 a program administered by or on behalf of the Judicial Branch. 5
23-(b) For the period beginning July 1, 2022, and ending June 30, 2023, 6
24-the Court Support Services Division of the Judicial Branch shall conduct 7
25-a survey of court-involved youths for the purpose of determining the 8
26-adequacy of existing Judicial Branch services with respect to lesbian, 9
27-gay, bisexual, transgender and queer youths and the need for any 10
28-additional or improved services for such youths. Such survey shall 11
29-ascertain (1) the court-involved youth's (A) age, (B) race, (C) sexual 12
30-orientation, and (D) gender identity, and (2) any other information 13
31-deemed necessary by the division. No court-involved youth shall be 14
32-required to complete such survey and the answers to such survey shall 15
33-be collected anonymously. 16
34-(c) Not later than January 1, 2024, the Court Support Services Division 17
35-of the Judicial Branch shall submit a report, in accordance with the 18 Substitute Bill No. 6112
28+(b) For the period beginning January 1, 2022, and ending December 6
29+31, 2022, the Court Support Services Division of the Judicial Branch shall 7
30+conduct a survey of court-involved youths for the purpose of 8
31+determining the adequacy of existing Judicial Branch services with 9
32+respect to lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender and queer youths and the 10
33+need for any additional or improved services for such youths. Such 11
34+survey shall ascertain (1) the court-involved youth's (A) age, (B) race, 12
35+(C) sexual orientation, and (D) gender identity, and (2) any other 13
36+information deemed necessary by the division. No court-involved 14
37+youth shall be required to complete such survey, and the answers to 15
38+such survey shall be collected anonymously. 16 Raised Bill No. 6112
3639
3740
38-LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06112-
39-R01-HB.docx }
40-2 of 2
4141
42+LCO No. 2628 2 of 2
43+
44+(c) Not later than July 1, 2023, the Court Support Services Division of 17
45+the Judicial Branch shall submit a report, in accordance with the 18
4246 provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, to the joint standing 19
4347 committee of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters 20
4448 relating to children. Such report shall include the results of the survey 21
4549 conducted pursuant to subsection (b) of this section and any 22
4650 recommendations for additional or improved Judicial Branch services 23
4751 for lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender and queer youths. 24
4852 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
4953 sections:
5054
5155 Section 1 from passage New section
5256
53-KID Joint Favorable Subst.
57+Statement of Purpose:
58+To require the Court Support Services Division of the Judicial Branch to
59+conduct a survey of court-involved youths in order to ascertain the need
60+for additional or improved services for lesbian, gay, bisexual,
61+transgender and queer youths.
62+[Proposed deletions are enclosed in brackets. Proposed additions are indicated by underline, except
63+that when the entire text of a bill or resolution or a section of a bill or resolution is new, it is not
64+underlined.]
5465