House | 06/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Public Act 21-64 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 453 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | File Number 21 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | House Calendar Number 51 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Public Hearing 02/04 | ||
House | 01/28/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |