House
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Special Act 21-10
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
File Number 622
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 360
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7517
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
File Number 224
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
House Calendar Number 185
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|