Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06121 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 26, 2021
Fiscal Note March 31, 2021
Bill January 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill June 16, 2021
Analysis April 28, 2021
Analysis April 27, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021
Analysis March 31, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 9, 2021