House | 07/07/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/24/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/24/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/23/2021 | Public Act 21-114 | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 379 | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | File Number 468 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | House Calendar Number 335 | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/15/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/09/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 03/19/2021 | Public Hearing 03/24 | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/17/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Vote to Draft |