Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06203 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 15, 2021
Bill January 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis August 6, 2021
Bill April 15, 2021
Analysis April 15, 2021
Bill March 17, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2021