House | 05/26/2021 | File Number 724 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 490 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule C 8938 | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule B 8915 | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8934 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | File Number 572 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | House Calendar Number 399 | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/16/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/12/2021 | Public Hearing 03/17 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Vote to Draft |