Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2021
Fiscal Note May 26, 2021
Fiscal Note May 25, 2021
Fiscal Note May 24, 2021
Fiscal Note May 19, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Bill January 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 26, 2021
Analysis May 25, 2021
Analysis April 22, 2021
Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021