House
|
06/30/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2021
|
Special Act 21-16
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
File Number 688
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 440
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8407
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
File Number 381
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
House Calendar Number 294
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2021
|
Public Hearing 02/11
|
|
|