House | 03/31/2021 | File Number 225 | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | House Calendar Number 186 | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 03/18/2021 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Drafted by Committee | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | Vote to Draft | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/18 | ||
House | 02/04/2021 | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |