House | 06/24/2021 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Public Act 21-65 | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | ||
House | 06/04/2021 | Senate Passed | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Senate Calendar Number 500 | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | House Passed | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 05/07/2021 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Joint Favorable | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | File Number 22 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | House Calendar Number 52 | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/21 5:00 PM | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Public Hearing 02/16 | ||
House | 01/29/2021 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |